Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Jean-François Percin de Montgaillard

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1633BornToulouse
6 Apr 166431.0SelectedBishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
12 Jan 166531.7ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
12 Jul 166532.2Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
13 Mar 171379.9DiedBishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Jean-François Percin de Montgaillard:
Bishop Pierre-Jean-François Percin de Montgaillard (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières

  • a bishop for 47.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 284
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1665, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 6 Apr 2015