Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel de Roquette

Deceased

Bishop of Autun


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1624¹BornToulouse
1662¹38.0Ordained PriestPriest
1 May 166642.3SelectedBishop of Autun, France
11 Oct 166642.7ConfirmedBishop of Autun, France
10 Apr 166743.2Ordained BishopBishop of Autun, France
21 Aug 166743.6InstalledBishop of Autun, France
22 Jul 170278.5ResignedBishop of Autun, France
22 Feb 170783.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Autun, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel de Roquette:
Bishop Gabriel de Roquette (born 1624, died ) Bishop of Autun

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 39.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 70
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1667, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 3 May 2015