Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Arthur-Richard Dillon

Deceased

Archbishop of Narbonne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1721BornSaint-Germain-en-Laye
15 Aug 175331.9SelectedBishop of Evreux, France
26 Sep 175332.0ConfirmedBishop of Evreux, France
28 Oct 175332.1Ordained BishopBishop of Evreux, France
14 May 175836.6SelectedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
18 Jul 175836.8ResignedBishop of Evreux, France
2 Aug 175836.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
5 Dec 176241.2SelectedArchbishop of Narbonne, France
25 Feb 176341.4ResignedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
21 Mar 176341.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Narbonne, France
5 Jul 180684.8DiedArchbishop of Narbonne, France

MicroData Summary for Arthur-Richard Dillon:
Archbishop Arthur-Richard Dillon (born , died ) Archbishop of Narbonne

  • a bishop for 52.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1753, Number 20
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 204, and Page 301
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 404

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015