Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Barthélemy de Gramont de Lanta

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Papoul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1625¹BornToulouse
11 Oct 167752.7AppointedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
5 Dec 167752.9Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
26 Feb 171691.1DiedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François de Barthélemy de Gramont de Lanta:
Bishop François de Barthélemy de Gramont de Lanta (born 1625, died ) Bishop of Saint-Papoul

  • a bishop for 38.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 306
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1677, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 17 Apr 2015