Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Bertier

Deceased

Bishop of Rieux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1556²Born
25 Feb 160246.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Rieux, France
25 Feb 160246.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Auzia
31 Aug 160246.6SucceededBishop of Rieux, France
6 Apr 160347.2Ordained BishopBishop of Rieux, France
15 Jul 162064.5DiedBishop of Rieux, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Bertier
Bishop Jean Bertier (born 1556, died ) Bishop of Rieux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToulouse

  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 296, and Page 103
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1603, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 May 2018

Quantcast