Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François-Honoré-Lancelot de Casaubon de Maniban

Deceased

Archbishop of Bordeaux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1684¹BornToulouse
8 Jan 172137.0SelectedBishop of Mirepoix, France
10 Sep 172137.6ConfirmedBishop of Mirepoix, France
26 Oct 172137.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mirepoix, France
15 Oct 172945.7SelectedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
8 Feb 173046.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
29 Jun 174359.4DiedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François-Honoré-Lancelot de Casaubon de Maniban:
Archbishop François-Honoré-Lancelot de Casaubon de Maniban (born 1684, died ) Archbishop of Bordeaux

  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 271
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015