Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Marie Sébastien de Saint-Blanquat

Bishop Emeritus of Montauban


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1925 BornToulouse
29 Mar 195226.4Ordained PriestPriest
5 Aug 197549.7AppointedBishop of Montauban, France
5 Oct 197549.9Ordained BishopBishop of Montauban, France
18 Nov 199570.0ResignedBishop of Montauban, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques Marie Sébastien de Saint-Blanquat:
Bishop Jacques Marie Sébastien de Saint-Blanquat (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Montauban

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Montauban.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013