Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri du Puget

Deceased

Bishop of Digne, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1655¹Born
17 Apr 170853.2SelectedBishop of Digne, France
3 Oct 170853.7ConfirmedBishop of Digne, France
9 Mar 171055.1Ordained BishopBishop of Digne, France
22 Jan 172873.0DiedBishop of Digne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henri du Puget
Bishop Henri du Puget (born 1655, died ) Bishop of Digne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToulouse

  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 184
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1710, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast