Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard (Bertrand) de Sénaux

Deceased

Bishop of Autun


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1646¹BornToulouse
1677¹31.0Ordained PriestPriest
4 Aug 170256.5SelectedBishop of Autun, France
12 Nov 170357.8ConfirmedBishop of Autun, France
6 Apr 170458.2Ordained BishopBishop of Autun, France
30 Apr 170963.3DiedBishop of Autun, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernard (Bertrand) de Sénaux:
Bishop Bernard (Bertrand) de Sénaux (born 1646, died ) Bishop of Autun

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 70
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1704, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 14 Jun 2015