Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre Cardinal de Bonzi

Deceased

Archbishop of Narbonne

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1631BornFlorence
165927.7SelectedBishop of Béziers, France
7 Jun 166029.1ConfirmedBishop of Béziers, France
12 Dec 166029.7Ordained BishopBishop of Béziers, France
10 Dec 166938.7SelectedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
28 Sep 167140.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
22 Feb 167240.9Elevated to Cardinal
12 Mar 167442.9AppointedArchbishop of Narbonne, France
19 Oct 167645.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio
19 Oct 168958.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
28 Nov 168958.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
11 Jul 170372.2DiedArchbishop of Narbonne, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Bonzi:
Cardinal Pierre de Bonzi (born , died ) Archbishop of Narbonne

  • a bishop for 42.6 years
  • a cardinal for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Feb 1672
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 280, and Page 377
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 116
  • ob/c2+: CB, 23 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 23 Dec 2013