Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Mathias de Barthélemy de Gramont de Lanta

Deceased

Bishop of Perpignan-Elne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
May 1687³BornToulouse
26 Oct 172336.4SelectedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
8 Apr 172638.9ConfirmedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
26 May 172639.0Ordained BishopBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
10 Jul 174356.1DiedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Mathias de Barthélemy de Gramont de Lanta:
Bishop Jean-Mathias de Barthélemy de Gramont de Lanta (born May 1687, died ) Bishop of Perpignan-Elne

  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 194
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1726, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015