Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Montauban

Dioecesis Montis Albani



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Montauban
11 July 1317ErectedDiocese of Cahors
Diocese of Toulouse
Diocese of Montauban (erected)
29 November 1801SuppressedDiocese of Montauban (suppressed) Archdiocese of Toulouse
Diocese of Montauban
6 October 1822RestoredArchdiocese of Toulouse Diocese of Montauban

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Montauban
1948161,664167,66496.4%25325278581328ap1951
1969177,000183,57296.4%219122317662260094ap1971
1980179,500185,60096.7%16241661,08114347295ap1981
1990190,000196,00096.9%12971361,397215288295ap1991
1999202,000206,80097.7%10281101,836614217295ap2000
2000201,000205,92497.6%101111121,794613206295ap2001
2001201,000206,03497.6%98101081,861612195295ap2002
2002201,000206,03497.6%899982,051611201295ap2003
2003160,000206,03477.7%899981,632612189295ap2004
2004160,000206,03477.7%8310931,720613194295ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 15 Jun 2013