Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Louis Cardinal de Nogaret de La Valette

Deceased

Former Archbishop-Elect of Toulouse, France

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro

Titular See: (never consecrated as a bishop)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1593Born
26 Aug 161320.5AppointedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
11 Jan 162127.9Elevated to Cardinal
20 Nov 162330.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
162733.8ResignedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
27 Sep 163946.6DiedFormer Archbishop-Elect of Toulouse, France

MicroData Summary for Louis de Nogaret de La Valette
Louis Cardinal de Nogaret de La Valette (born , died ) Former Archbishop-Elect of Toulouse

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAngoulême, Diocese of Angoulême

  • a cardinal for 18.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 11 Jan 1621

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast