Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sabin-Marie Saint-Gaudens

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Agen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1921BornMiremont
29 Jun 194826.7Ordained PriestPriest
27 Feb 196745.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux), France
27 Feb 196745.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Lapda
21 May 196745.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lapda
15 Sep 197250.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Agen, France
13 Mar 197654.4SucceededBishop of Agen, France
13 Dec 199675.2RetiredBishop of Agen, France
23 Dec 200180.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Agen, France

MicroData Summary for Sabin-Marie Saint-Gaudens:
Bishop Sabin-Marie Saint-Gaudens (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Agen

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015