Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Paulin-Pierre Cardinal Andrieu

Deceased

Archbishop of Bordeaux

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1849BornSeysses
30 May 187424.5Ordained PriestPriest of Toulouse (-Narbonne), France
5 Apr 190151.3SelectedBishop of Marseille, France
18 Apr 190151.4ConfirmedBishop of Marseille, France
25 Jul 190151.6Ordained BishopBishop of Marseille, France
16 Dec 190758.0Elevated to Cardinal
19 Dec 190758.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio
2 Jan 190959.1AppointedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
15 Feb 193585.2DiedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France

MicroData Summary for Paulin-Pierre Andrieu:
Cardinal Paulin-Pierre Andrieu (born , died ) Archbishop of Bordeaux

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
  • a cardinal for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 372
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 38
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 96

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013