Catholic-Hierarchy DC

François-Désiré Cardinal Mathieu

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Toulouse (-Narbonne), France

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1839Born
30 May 186324.0Ordained PriestPriest of Nancy (-Toul), France
3 Jan 189353.5SelectedBishop of Angers, France
19 Jan 189353.6ConfirmedBishop of Angers, France
20 Mar 189353.8Ordained BishopBishop of Angers, France
30 May 189657.0SelectedArchbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne), France
25 Jun 189657.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne), France
19 Jun 189960.0Elevated to Cardinal
22 Jun 189960.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
27 Nov 189960.4ResignedArchbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne), France
26 Oct 190869.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Toulouse (-Narbonne), France

MicroData Summary for François-Désiré Mathieu (VIAF: 46861816)
François-Désiré Cardinal Mathieu (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Toulouse (-Narbonne)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEinville-au-Jard, Diocese of Nancy (-Toul)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Angers, Diocese of Angers
Death PlaceLondon, Archdiocese of Westminster, England, Great Britain
Buried Place (Original)Cimetière du Sud, Cemetery, Nancy, Diocese of Nancy (-Toul)

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
  • a cardinal for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 100, and Page 551
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 52
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Jun 1899
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017