Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean Cardinal d’Orléans-Longueville

Deceased

Archbishop of Toulouse

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti

Bishop of Orléans


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1484BornParthenay
29 Nov 150319.9AppointedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
26 Apr 151733.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Toulouse, France
26 Jun 152137.5AppointedBishop of Orléans, France
3 Mar 153349.2Elevated to Cardinal
3 Mar 153349.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
24 Sep 153349.7DiedArchbishop of Toulouse, France

MicroData Summary for Jean d’Orléans-Longueville:
Cardinal Jean d’Orléans-Longueville (died ) Archbishop of Toulouse

  • a bishop for 16.4 years
  • a cardinal for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 3 Mar 1533
  • ob/c2+: CB, 9 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 10 Nov 2013