Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guy André Marie de Kérimel, Comm. l'Emm.

Bishop of Grenoble-Vienne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1953 BornMeknès, Morocco
29 Jun 198632.9Ordained PriestPriest of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
19 Feb 200147.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nice, France
19 Feb 200147.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Casae Medianae
17 Jun 200147.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Casae Medianae
6 May 200450.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Grenoble, France
10 Jun 200652.8SucceededBishop of Grenoble, France

MicroData Summary for Guy André Marie de Kérimel:
Bishop Guy André Marie de Kérimel Comm. l'Emm. (born ) Bishop of Grenoble-Vienne

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Grenoble-Vienne.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • s: Bollettino, 10 Jun 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,994

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013