Catholic-Hierarchy DC

(Layman) Odet de Coligny de Châtillon

Deceased

Note/Previous Titular See: (left the Church)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1517BornChâtillon-sur-Loing
7 Nov 153316.3Elevated to Cardinal
10 Nov 153316.3InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Sergio e Bacco
29 Apr 153416.8AppointedAdministrator of Toulouse, France
20 Oct 153518.3AppointedAdministrator of Beauvais, France
25 Feb 154931.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
20 Oct 155033.3ResignedAdministrator of Toulouse, France
31 Mar 156345.7ResignedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
31 Mar 156345.7ResignedAdministrator of Beauvais, France
13 Apr 157153.8Died

MicroData Summary for Odet de Coligny de Châtillon:
Layman Odet de Coligny de Châtillon (born , died ) of (unknown)

  • a cardinal for 29.4 years (Resigned)

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 Nov 1533

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013