Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Florian-Jules-Félix Cardinal Desprez

Deceased

Archbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne)

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1807BornOstricourt
19 Dec 182922.7Ordained PriestPriest of Cambrai, France
24 Jul 185043.3SelectedBishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion
3 Oct 185043.5ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion
5 Jan 185143.7Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion
14 Feb 185749.8SelectedBishop of Limoges, France
19 Mar 185749.9ConfirmedBishop of Limoges, France
23 Aug 185952.4SelectedArchbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne), France
26 Sep 185952.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne), France
12 May 187972.1Elevated to Cardinal
22 Sep 187972.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
21 Jan 189587.8DiedArchbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne), France

MicroData Summary for Florian-Jules-Félix Desprez:
Cardinal Florian-Jules-Félix Desprez (born , died ) Archbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne)

  • a priest for 65.1 years
  • a bishop for 44.0 years
  • a cardinal for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 247, and Page 337
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 551, and Page 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013