Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Antoine Pascal Hyacinthe Sermet] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Haute-Garonne (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1732Born
28 Mar 179158.9SelectedBishop of [Haute-Garonne (Constitutional), France]
26 Apr 179159.0Ordained BishopBishop of [Haute-Garonne (Constitutional), France]
Oct 1801³69.4ResignedBishop of [Haute-Garonne (Constitutional), France]
24 Aug 180876.3DiedBishop Emeritus of [Haute-Garonne (Constitutional), France]

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine Pascal Hyacinthe Sermet (VIAF: 179922927)
Bishop Antoine Pascal Hyacinthe Sermet (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Haute-Garonne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToulouse
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Oct 2018

Quantcast