Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Philippe Curbeliť

Under Secretary of the Dicastery for the Doctrine of the Faith

Priest of Toulouse (-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1968 Born
30 Apr 199526.7Ordained PriestPriest of Toulouse (-Narbonne-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux), France
Sep 2012³44.0AppointedOfficial of the Congregation for Catholic Education (for Institutes of Study)
5 Jun 202253.8AppointedOfficial of the Dicastery for Culture and Education
6 Jul 202253.8AppointedUnder Secretary of the Dicastery for the Doctrine of the Faith

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philippe Curbeliť
(WikiData: Q112943853)
Father Philippe Curbeliť (born ) Under Secretary of Doctrine of the Faith

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeuilly-sur-Seine, France

Please contact the Father through the Dicastery for the Doctrine of the Faith.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Jul 2022
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2022, Page 1,183

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024