Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Adélaïde-Adolphe Lannéluc

Deceased

Bishop of Aire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1793BornToulouse
20 Dec 181724.4Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jan 183945.4SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Aire, France
11 Jul 183945.9ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Aire, France
11 Jul 183945.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Agathopolis
15 Sep 183946.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Agathopolis
12 Dec 183946.3SucceededBishop of Aire, France
30 Jun 185662.9DiedBishop of Aire, France

MicroData Summary for François-Adélaïde-Adolphe Lannéluc:
Bishop François-Adélaïde-Adolphe Lannéluc (born , died ) Bishop of Aire

  • a priest for 38.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 62, and Page 94

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013