Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Georges Cardinal d’Armagnac

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Tours, France

Cardinal-Priest of San Nicola in Carcere

Administrator of Toulouse


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1501¹Born
19 Jan 153029.0AppointedBishop of Rodez, France
25 Jan 153130.0Ordained BishopBishop of Rodez, France
17 Jun 153635.4AppointedAdministrator of Vabres, France
3 Jul 153635.5AppointedBishop of Vabres, France
19 Dec 154443.9Elevated to Cardinal
9 Jan 154544.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
13 Jan 154847.0AppointedArchbishop of Tours, France
6 Apr 155150.2ResignedArchbishop of Tours, France
1555²54.0AppointedAdministrator of Lescar, France
1555²54.0ResignedAdministrator of Lescar, France
12 Jun 155655.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
27 Jun 156160.4ResignedBishop of Rodez, France
6 Jul 156261.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Nicola in Carcere
31 Aug 156261.6AppointedAdministrator of Toulouse, France
6 Jan 157776.0AppointedAdministrator of Avignon, France
5 Nov 158281.8ResignedAdministrator of Toulouse, France
8 Jun 158483.4AppointedAdministrator of Toulouse, France
10 Jul 158584.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Tours, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Georges d’Armagnac (VIAF: 59219003)
Georges Cardinal d’Armagnac (born 1501, died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Tours

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGascogne
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceAvignon, Archdiocese of Avignon
Buried Place (Original)Archbishops' Chapel, Notre Dame des Doms, Cathedral, Avignon, Archdiocese of Avignon

  • a bishop for 54.4 years
  • a cardinal for 40.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Dec 1544
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,805
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 127, and Page 325

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018