Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron)

Dioecesis Baionensis (-Lascurrensis et Oloronensis)



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • United: 22 June 1909
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bordeaux (-Bazas)
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 7,644 (2,952 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sud-Ouest
  • Official Web Site: http://diocese64.org/
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, 16 Place Mgr. Vansteenberghe, 64115 Bayonne CEDEX, France
  • Telephone: 5.59.59.16.88
  • Fax: 5.59.59.67.90

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Bayonne
4th CenturyErectedDiocese of Bayonne (erected) ((or 6th Century))
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of (Saint-Bernard de) Comminges (suppressed) Diocese of Bayonne
Archdiocese of Toulouse
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Lescar (suppressed) Diocese of Agen
Diocese of Bayonne
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Lombez (suppressed) Diocese of Bayonne
Archdiocese of Toulouse
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Tarbes (suppressed) Diocese of Agen
Diocese of Bayonne
6 October 1822Territory LostDiocese of Bayonne Diocese of Tarbes
6 October 1822Territory LostDiocese of Bayonne Diocese of Aire
Diocese of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron)
22 June 1909UnitedDiocese of Bayonne Diocese of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron)
8 December 2002Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron) (from Auch)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron)
1950407,338415,79798.0%8531661,0193993081,983512ap1951
1959416,060420,01999.1%8551911,0463973381,900520ap1960
1970501,274508,73498.5%7161458615822241,816527ap1971
1980532,600536,70099.2%6441547986672371,610527ap1981
1990554,000575,00096.3%50114164286232261,330526ap1991
1995550,000581,00094.7%4081315391,02062111,153523ap2000
2000550,000581,00094.7%4021315331,03162111,153523ap2001
2001550,000581,00094.7%4021315331,03162111,153523ap2002
2002550,000620,76388.6%3711284991,102618983589ap2003
2003550,000620,76388.6%3361304661,180519781269ap2004
2004550,000620,76388.6%3311404711,167519879369ap2005
2006505,000606,00083.3%3491394881,034620075669ap2007
2012570,000669,30085.2%2791234021,417816347169ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014