Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Augustin Germain

Deceased

Archbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1839Born
21 Mar 186324.1Ordained PriestPriest of Nîmes, France
14 Apr 189758.1SelectedBishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France
19 Apr 189758.1ConfirmedBishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France
10 Aug 189758.4Ordained BishopBishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France
7 Dec 189960.8SelectedArchbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne), France
14 Dec 189960.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne), France
27 Mar 190061.1InstalledArchbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne), France
1 Jun 192889.3DiedArchbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne), France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Augustin Germain (VIAF: 76307480)
Archbishop Jean-Augustin Germain (born , died ) Archbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeaucaire
Ordained BishopSt. Bandile, Nîmes, Diocese of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès)

  • a priest for 65.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 489, and Page 551
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017