Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean-Raymond Cardinal de Comminges

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Jul 1309AppointedBishop of Maguelonne, France
13 Nov 1317AppointedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
18 Dec 1327Elevated to Cardinal
Jun 1331²AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
1348¹DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Raymond de Comminges
Jean-Raymond Cardinal de Comminges (died 1348) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCommings, Diocese of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges, France
Death PlaceAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a cardinal for 20.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1327
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 488

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 10 Oct 2017