Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Charles-Antoine Cardinal de la Roche-Aymon

Deceased

Archbishop of Reims


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1697BornMainsat
11 Jun 172528.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Limoges, France
11 Jun 172528.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sarepta
5 Aug 172528.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sarepta
27 Dec 172932.9SelectedBishop of Tarbes, France
2 Oct 173033.6ConfirmedBishop of Tarbes, France
10 Jan 174042.9SelectedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
11 Nov 174043.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
2 Oct 175255.6SelectedArchbishop of Narbonne, France
18 Dec 175255.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Narbonne, France
5 Dec 176265.8SelectedArchbishop of Reims, France
24 Jan 176365.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Reims, France
16 Dec 177174.8Elevated to Cardinal
27 Oct 177780.7DiedArchbishop of Reims, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Antoine de la Roche-Aymon:
Cardinal Charles-Antoine de la Roche-Aymon (born , died ) Archbishop of Reims

  • a bishop for 52.2 years
  • a cardinal for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013