Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre de La Broue

Deceased

Bishop of Mirepoix


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Feb 1644BornToulouse
167530.9Ordained PriestPriest
24 Feb 167935.1SelectedBishop of Mirepoix, France
17 Jul 167935.5ConfirmedBishop of Mirepoix, France
8 Sep 168036.6Ordained BishopBishop of Mirepoix, France
20 Sep 172076.6DiedBishop of Mirepoix, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre de La Broue:
Bishop Pierre de La Broue (died ) Bishop of Mirepoix

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013