Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul de Foix de Carmaing

Deceased

Archbishop of Toulouse


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1528¹Born
5 Nov 158254.8AppointedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
13 Dec 158254.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Toulouse, France
29 May 158456.4DiedArchbishop of Toulouse, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul de Foix de Carmaing
Archbishop Paul de Foix de Carmaing (born 1528, died ) Archbishop of Toulouse

  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 315

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 23 Dec 2016