Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean-François-Joseph Cardinal de Rochechouard de Faudoas

Deceased

Bishop of Laon

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1708BornToulouse
25 Jun 174133.4SelectedBishop of Laon, France
18 Sep 174133.6ConfirmedBishop of Laon, France
15 Oct 174133.7Ordained BishopBishop of Laon, France
23 Nov 176153.8Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jan 176254.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
20 Mar 177769.1DiedBishop of Laon, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-François-Joseph de Rochechouard de Faudoas:
Cardinal Jean-François-Joseph de Rochechouard de Faudoas (born , died ) Bishop of Laon

  • a bishop for 35.4 years
  • a cardinal for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013