Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Coignet de Marmiesse

Deceased

Bishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1619¹BornToulouse
28 May 165334.4SelectedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans, France
19 Oct 165435.7ConfirmedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans, France
12 Nov 165637.8Ordained BishopBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans, France
22 Jan 168061.0DiedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernard Coignet de Marmiesse:
Bishop Bernard Coignet de Marmiesse (died ) Bishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans

  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 160
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1656, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 29 Mar 2015