Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Joseph Marie Despierre, Ist. del Prado

Bishop Emeritus of Carcassonne, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1928 Born
24 Jun 195224.1Ordained PriestPriest of Istituto del Prado
25 Aug 198254.3AppointedBishop of Carcassonne, France
10 Oct 198254.4Ordained BishopBishop of Carcassonne, France
28 Jun 200476.1RetiredBishop of Carcassonne, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques Joseph Marie Despierre
Bishop Jacques Joseph Marie Despierre Ist. del Prado (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Carcassonne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToulouse

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Carcassonne.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 May 2017