Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur)

Archidioecesis Albiensis (-Castrensis-Vauriensis)



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Jean Marie Henri Legrez, O.P., Archbishop

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Albi
3rd CenturyErectedDiocese of Albi (erected)
11 July 1317Territory LostDiocese of Albi Diocese of Castres (erected)
Archdiocese of Albi
3 October 1678ElevatedDiocese of Albi Archdiocese of Albi
29 November 1801SuppressedArchdiocese of Albi (suppressed) Diocese of Montpellier
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Castres (suppressed) Archdiocese of Albi
Archdiocese of Albi
6 October 1822RestoredDiocese of Montpellier Archdiocese of Albi
Archdiocese of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur)
17 February 1922Name ChangedArchdiocese of Albi Archdiocese of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur)
8 December 2002ElevatedArchdiocese of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur) (no longer a Metropolitan)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur)
1959290,000308,70093.9%4391325715072321,360506ap1960
1970300,000532,01156.4%2732731,098509ap1971
1980300,800341,00088.2%28462901,037116764509ap1981
1990304,000344,00088.4%21182191,388321861509ap1991
1999300,000342,80087.5%16391721,7441443573504ap2000
2000340,000354,85795.8%16381711,988431490509ap2001
2001300,000354,86784.5%153502031,4777109514509ap2002
2002300,000354,86784.5%153431961,530675390509ap2003
2003280,000354,86778.9%1451122571,08910149482509ap2004
2004280,000354,86778.9%141421831,5301181469509ap2005
2006281,000357,00078.7%134421761,5961087439509ap2007
2012286,600385,70074.3%131421731,6561378341509ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 13 Nov 2013