Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominique-Marie Savy

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Aire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1771BornToulouse
19 Dec 180736.6Ordained PriestPriest
13 Dec 182655.6SelectedBishop of Aire, France
25 Jun 182756.1ConfirmedBishop of Aire, France
29 Jul 182756.2Ordained BishopBishop of Aire, France
12 Dec 183968.6ResignedBishop of Aire, France
14 Dec 1842³71.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Aire, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dominique-Marie Savy:
Bishop Dominique-Marie Savy (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aire

  • a priest for 35.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 94

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013