Catholic-Hierarchy DC

François Cardinal de Joyeuse

Deceased

Archbishop of Rouen, France

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Prefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1562Born
20 Oct 158119.3AppointedArchbishop of Narbonne, France
12 Dec 158321.4Elevated to Cardinal
20 May 158522.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
25 Jan 158623.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Narbonne, France
11 Dec 158725.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio
4 Nov 158826.3AppointedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
27 Apr 159431.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
24 Mar 160441.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
13 Oct 160442.3SelectedArchbishop of Rouen, France
1 Dec 160442.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Rouen, France
1 Apr 160542.7AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
17 Aug 161149.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
1613¹50.5ResignedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
23 Aug 161553.1DiedArchbishop of Rouen, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for François de Joyeuse (VIAF: 41995792)
François Cardinal de Joyeuse (born , died ) Archbishop of Rouen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarcassonne, Diocese of Carcassonne
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceCollége d'Avignon, Avignon, Archdiocese of Avignon
Buried Place (Current)Saint-Louis of Pontoise, Rouen, Archdiocese of Rouen

  • a bishop for 29.5 years
  • a cardinal for 31.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Dec 1583
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1586, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast