Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jules-Louis-Marie de Carsalade du Pont

Deceased

Bishop of Perpignan-Elne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1847BornSimorre
25 Mar 187124.1Ordained PriestPriest of Toulouse (-Narbonne), France
7 Dec 189952.8SelectedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
14 Dec 189952.8ConfirmedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
22 Feb 190053.0Ordained BishopBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
15 Mar 190053.1InstalledBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
29 Dec 193285.9DiedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France

MicroData Summary for Jules-Louis-Marie de Carsalade du Pont:
Bishop Jules-Louis-Marie de Carsalade du Pont (born , died ) Bishop of Perpignan-Elne

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 258

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013