Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Koukl

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Litoměřice, Czech Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1926Born
23 Apr 195023.4Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jul 198962.7AppointedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
27 Aug 198962.8Ordained BishopBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
24 Dec 200377.1RetiredBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
22 May 201083.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Litoměřice, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Josef Koukl
Bishop Josef Koukl (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Litoměřice

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrno

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,466
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)
  • c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast