Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frantisek Brusák

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

Titular Bishop of Acmonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1840BornVohavec
25 Jul 186827.7Ordained PriestPriest
5 May 190867.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
5 May 190867.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Acmonia
17 May 190867.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acmonia
5 Apr 191877.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Frantisek Brusák:
Bishop Frantisek Brusák (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 35
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013