Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Johann Wenzel Wokaun (Woknau)

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

Titular Bishop of Callinicum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1691BornBezno
16 Mar 171524.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
6 Apr 171524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
16 Sep 174857.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
16 Sep 174857.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Callinicum
6 Oct 174857.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Callinicum
7 Feb 175765.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Anton Johann Wenzel Wokaun (Woknau):
Bishop Anton Johann Wenzel Wokaun (Woknau) (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 8.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 141, and Page 453
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1748, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015