Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonín Liška, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1924BornBohumilice
15 Aug 194419.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
22 Sep 195127.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
19 May 198863.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
19 May 198863.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Vergi
11 Jun 198863.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vergi
28 Aug 199166.9AppointedBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
25 Sep 200278.0RetiredBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
15 Oct 200379.0DiedBishop Emeritus of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Antonín Liška:
Bishop Antonín Liška C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,629
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • prof: CB, 11 Jan 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 12 Jan 2016