Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Franz Christoph von Talmberg

Deceased

Bishop of Hradec Králové


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1644BornRattagen
16 Jun 166924.5Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
15 Jan 167631.0SelectedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
19 Oct 167631.8ConfirmedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
3 Jan 167732.0Ordained BishopBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
3 Apr 169853.3DiedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Johann Franz Christoph von Talmberg:
Bishop Johann Franz Christoph von Talmberg (born , died ) Bishop of Hradec Králové

  • a priest for 28.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 331

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013