Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Matthäus Ferdinand Sobek von Bilenberg, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Praha {Prague}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1618BornRajhrad
163819.2ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
10 Nov 166446.1AppointedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
15 Mar 166546.4Ordained BishopBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
10 Jun 166849.7SelectedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
9 Mar 166950.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
4 May 166950.6InstalledArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
29 Apr 167556.6DiedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Matthäus Ferdinand Sobek von Bilenberg:
Archbishop Matthäus Ferdinand Sobek von Bilenberg O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Praha {Prague}

  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 323
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,011
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1665, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 295

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 13 Apr 2015