Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Podlaha

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

Titular Bishop of Paphus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1865BornPraha
5 Jul 188823.5Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
8 Mar 192055.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
8 Mar 192055.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Paphus
11 Apr 192055.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paphus
14 Feb 193267.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Anton Podlaha:
Bishop Anton Podlaha (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • op/ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013