Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonin Eltschkner

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Titular Bishop of Zephyrium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1880Born
18 Mar 190525.2Ordained PriestPriest of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
10 Feb 193353.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
10 Feb 193353.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Zephyrium
19 Mar 193353.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zephyrium
22 Feb 196181.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Antonin Eltschkner
Bishop Antonin Eltschkner (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

EventPlace
Birth PlacePolicka

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast