Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jan Cardinal Očko z Vlašim

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Cardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1292²Born
17 Nov 135159.8AppointedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
13 Apr 135260.2Ordained BishopBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
12 Jul 136472.5SelectedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
23 Aug 136472.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
18 Sep 137886.7Elevated to Cardinal
18 Sep 137886.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
6 Mar 137987.1ResignedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
14 Jan 138088.0DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Očko z Vlašim
Jan Cardinal Očko z Vlašim (born 1292, died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Praha {Prague}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWlašim, Bohemia
Ordained BishopCathedral, Praha, Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}
Death PlacePraha, Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}
Buried Place (Original)Sankts Attale and Erard Chapel, Cathedral, Praha, Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}

  • a bishop for 27.7 years
  • a cardinal for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 376
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 181, Number 14,916
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Sep 1378

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast