Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johann Lohel, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Grand Master of Knights of the Cross with the Red Star


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1549²Born
1576²27.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
30 Jul 160354.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
30 Jul 160354.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Cilicia
3 Aug 160354.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Cilicia
1612²63.0AppointedGrand Master of Knights of the Cross with the Red Star
30 Apr 161263.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
18 Sep 161263.7SucceededArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
2 Nov 1622²73.8DiedArchbishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Lohel
Archbishop Johann Lohel O. Praem. (born 1549, died ) Archbishop of Praha {Prague}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEger

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 288, and Page 308
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1603, Number 13
  • b: Catholic Encyclopedia, Volume 9, Page 331

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Jan 2017