Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Sotomayor, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Titular Bishop of Selymbria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1612¹Born
28 Jan 167563.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
28 Jan 167563.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Selymbria
14 Apr 167563.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Selymbria
25 Jan 1679³67.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Sotomayor
Bishop Antonio Sotomayor O.S.B. (born 1612, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGalicia

  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 352
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 212, Number 1,323
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1675, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast