Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jindřich Břetislav

Deceased

Bishop of Praha, Czech Republic


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Mar 1182AppointedBishop of Praha, Czech Republic
22 May 1182Ordained PriestPriest
23 May 1182Ordained BishopBishop of Praha, Czech Republic
14 Jun 1197³DiedBishop of Praha, Czech Republic

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jindřich Břetislav
Bishop Jindřich Břetislav (died ) Bishop of Praha

  • a priest for 15.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,798

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast