Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Adalbert (Vojtĕch) , O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Praha, Czech Republic

Member of Order of Saint Benedict


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
957¹Born
981²24.0Ordained PriestPriest of Praha, Czech Republic
19 Feb 98225.1AppointedBishop of Praha, Czech Republic
11 Jun 98225.4Ordained BishopBishop of Praha, Czech Republic
98831.0ResignedBishop of Praha, Czech Republic
17 Apr 99033.2ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
992²35.0AppointedBishop of Praha, Czech Republic
99437.0ResignedBishop of Praha, Czech Republic
23 Apr 99740.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Praha, Czech Republic
999Canonized

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for St. Adalbert (Vojtĕch) (VIAF: 84043854)
Bishop St. Adalbert (Vojtĕch) O.S.B. (born 957, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Praha

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastle of Libice

  • a priest for 16.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: CB, 28 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Mar 2017